THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:01:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905)845 2571
Extension: 2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St.
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166032581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 Wellesley Street East
Sunnybrook Holland Centre
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
Phone: 416-967-8646
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Massage Therapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Massage Therapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905)845 2571
Extension: 2971
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St.
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166032581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 Wellesley Street East
Sunnybrook Holland Centre
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
Phone: 416-967-8646
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Massage Therapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Massage Therapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAROLD PHILLIPS BRADEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAROLD PHILLIPS BRADEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985