THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:37:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1025 Elcho Street
Box 220
Bella Coola British Columbia V0T 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (250) 799-5311
Fax: +1 (833) 666-0585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Philip McGuire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1025 Elcho Street
Box 220
Bella Coola British Columbia V0T 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (250) 799-5311
Fax: +1 (833) 666-0585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Philip McGuire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD PHILIP MCGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD PHILIP MCGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985