THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:40:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 49 Place D'Armes
Kingston, Ontario
Kingston Ontario K7M 8T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 5363057
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 307-797 Princess St
Kingston ON K7L 1G1
Phone: 6135427095
Fax: 6135422224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh Langley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 49 Place D'Armes
Kingston, Ontario
Kingston Ontario K7M 8T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 5363057
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 307-797 Princess St
Kingston ON K7L 1G1
Phone: 6135427095
Fax: 6135422224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh Langley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH GREGORY LANGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH GREGORY LANGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985