THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
40 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 445-2811
Fax: (416) 445-2365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 27 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
40 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 445-2811
Fax: (416) 445-2365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 27 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSSEN ROUSSEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSEV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSSEN ROUSSEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSEV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985