THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 The East Mall
Cloverdale Mall
Suite 174B
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 3Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 239-6122
Fax: (416) 239-4895

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bohdan Pich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 The East Mall
Cloverdale Mall
Suite 174B
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 3Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 239-6122
Fax: (416) 239-4895

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bohdan Pich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOHDAN OLEXANDER PICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOHDAN OLEXANDER PICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 27 Sep 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 27 Sep 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985