THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:48:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985