THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: Giacomelli, Dianne Angela (Used Until: 15 Jun 1997)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-5425 Creditview Rd
Mississauga ON L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-826-1164
Fax: 905-826-1214
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare -CMHS
Halton Geriatric Mental Health
Outreach Program
5230 South Service Road
Burlington Ontario L7L 5K2
Phone: 905-681-8233
Fax: 905-681-8628
Address: 120-2695 North Sheridan Way
Mississauga ON L5K 2N6
Phone: 905-362-3508
Fax: 905-670-7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: Giacomelli, Dianne Angela (Used Until: 15 Jun 1997)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-5425 Creditview Rd
Mississauga ON L5V 2P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-826-1164
Fax: 905-826-1214
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare -CMHS
Halton Geriatric Mental Health
Outreach Program
5230 South Service Road
Burlington Ontario L7L 5K2
Phone: 905-681-8233
Fax: 905-681-8628
Address: 120-2695 North Sheridan Way
Mississauga ON L5K 2N6
Phone: 905-362-3508
Fax: 905-670-7040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANNE ANGELA LEZON-GIACOMELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEZON-GIACOMELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANNE ANGELA LEZON-GIACOMELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEZON-GIACOMELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985