THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:12:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Third Avenue
Suite 250
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: 705-268-7444
Address: Timmins And District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6345
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Woods & Dr. Laurence Malo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Third Avenue
Suite 250
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: 705-268-7444
Address: Timmins And District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6345
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Woods & Dr. Laurence Malo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURENCE GERARD MALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURENCE GERARD MALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985