THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Medical Protective Assoc
875 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-725-2000
Fax: 613-725-1300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Medical Protective Assoc
875 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-725-2000
Fax: 613-725-1300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLANID ANN CRANNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLANID ANN CRANNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985