THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 17:01:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 6
1577 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-0183
Fax: (416) 461-4833

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tariq Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 6
1577 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-0183
Fax: (416) 461-4833

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tariq Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985