THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:27:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Brereton and Dr. Andrew Moran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Brereton and Dr. Andrew Moran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1985