THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:05:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Jul 2007
Summary:
As from July 23, 2007, Dr. David Martin Fraser undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that he has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 23 Jul 2007
Summary:
As from July 23, 2007, Dr. David Martin Fraser undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that he has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985