THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 21 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 21 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2019


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985