THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 22:59:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cedars Professional Park
2937 66 Street NW
Edmonton Alberta T6K 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (780) 461-6802
Fax: (780) 450-0621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cedars Professional Park
2937 66 Street NW
Edmonton Alberta T6K 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (780) 461-6802
Fax: (780) 450-0621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE ANDRE KASZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE ANDRE KASZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1985
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1985