THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-5525
Fax: (905) 662-1855

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel S. Sewchand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sewchand (CPSO#: 56205 )
Business Address: 2 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1G8
(905) 662-5525

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-5525
Fax: (905) 662-1855

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel S. Sewchand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sewchand (CPSO#: 56205 )
Business Address: 2 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1G8
(905) 662-5525

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIONEL SATYANAND SEWCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEWCHAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIONEL SATYANAND SEWCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEWCHAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 30 Jul 2001
Summary of Decision:
On July 30, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sewchand(s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct with respect to conduct unbecoming a physician. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1) A reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register
2) A three-month suspension, commencing April 30, 2002 which will be suspended if Dr. Sewchand completes a course in Physician Boundaries and Anger Management approved by the College by April 30, 2002.
3) Costs of $2,500.00 to be paid to the College by December 31, 2001.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2001

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 30 Jul 2001
Summary of Decision:
On July 30, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sewchand(s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct with respect to conduct unbecoming a physician. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1) A reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register
2) A three-month suspension, commencing April 30, 2002 which will be suspended if Dr. Sewchand completes a course in Physician Boundaries and Anger Management approved by the College by April 30, 2002.
3) Costs of $2,500.00 to be paid to the College by December 31, 2001.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2001

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1985