THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:36:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records should be directed to Dr. Michelson via e-mail at [email protected]
Date Received: 05 Oct 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records should be directed to Dr. Michelson via e-mail at [email protected]
Date Received: 05 Oct 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Roy Ross Mickelson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2018:

The College commenced an investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. Following this investigation, Dr. Mickelson underwent remediation and submitted to a practice reassessment. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. While the reassessment process was ongoing, Dr. Mickelson retired from the practice of medicine. Accordingly:

-Dr. Mickelson will resign from the College, effective June 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
-Dr. Mickelson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until his resignation.
-Dr. Mickelson must not prescribe, recommend or make use of any oral chelation agents in respect of patients.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Roy Ross Mickelson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2018:

The College commenced an investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. Following this investigation, Dr. Mickelson underwent remediation and submitted to a practice reassessment. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. While the reassessment process was ongoing, Dr. Mickelson retired from the practice of medicine. Accordingly:

-Dr. Mickelson will resign from the College, effective June 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
-Dr. Mickelson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until his resignation.
-Dr. Mickelson must not prescribe, recommend or make use of any oral chelation agents in respect of patients.

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 16 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 1985