THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:36:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 16 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Safe Stor Records Management
Tel: 905-892-0010
Date Received: 09 Mar 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dermot B O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 16 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Safe Stor Records Management
Tel: 905-892-0010
Date Received: 09 Mar 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dermot B O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 20 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 1985