THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:09:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ranchi University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KONKANI, PORTUGUESE, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For any immigration Canada file inquiries, please contact Wendy Marks at [email protected] or at Tel: 613 437 6978
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 416-398-0632
Toll Free: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 04 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KONKANI, PORTUGUESE, SWAHILI
Medical School: Ranchi University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For any immigration Canada file inquiries, please contact Wendy Marks at [email protected] or at Tel: 613 437 6978
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: 416-398-0632
Toll Free: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 04 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ranchi University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 1985