THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:38:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahradnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK
Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahradnik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1985