THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record with Dr. Lamb should contact Records Access Services Canada Inc. Toll-Free at
1-800-971-8038 ext. 702
Date Received: 22 Mar 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record with Dr. Lamb should contact Records Access Services Canada Inc. Toll-Free at
1-800-971-8038 ext. 702
Date Received: 22 Mar 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David John Lamb to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 15, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Lamb’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Lamb failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Effective, November 1, 2017, Dr. Lamb must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Effective, November 1, 2017, Dr. Lamb must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Lamb has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:
Narcotic Drugs
Narcotic Preparations
Controlled Drugs
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David John Lamb to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 15, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Lamb’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Lamb failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Effective, November 1, 2017, Dr. Lamb must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Effective, November 1, 2017, Dr. Lamb must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Lamb has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:
Narcotic Drugs
Narcotic Preparations
Controlled Drugs
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca 

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 1986