THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:20:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please send a written request to the following address to Dr. Arif Naqvi:

2622 Eglington Ave E
Toronto ON M1K 2S3
Date Received: 25 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please send a written request to the following address to Dr. Arif Naqvi:

2622 Eglington Ave E
Toronto ON M1K 2S3
Date Received: 25 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 1986