THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:56:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1972
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be directed to:

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Health Records Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton
ON., L6R 3J7
Telephone: 905-494-2120
Date Received: 16 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagpurkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Pune, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be directed to:

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Health Records Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton
ON., L6R 3J7
Telephone: 905-494-2120
Date Received: 16 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagpurkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1986