THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:29:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
420 North Service Road East
Oakville Ontario L6H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Fax: (905) 338-2923
Address: 809 Brant street Suite 2
Burlington Ontario L7R 2J4
Phone: (905) 632-1329
Fax: (905) 632-9015
Address: 33 Blair Rd
Cambridge ON N1S 2H7
Phone: 905-338-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 824 King ST. West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E3
Phone: 1-519-579-2002
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-100 Victoria St S
Kitchener ON N2G 4Y9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-72 Victoria St S
unit 101
Kitchener ON N2G 4Y9
Phone: 905-338-3331
Fax: 9053382923
Address: 1408 Ernest Ave #205
London Ontario N6E 3B2
Phone: 1-519-685-6719
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-931 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N5Z 3H9
Phone: 905-338-3331
Fax: 905-338-2923
Address: 101 The Queensway West, Suite 202
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-1114
Fax: (905) 272-1147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
420 North Service Road East
Oakville Ontario L6H 5R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Fax: (905) 338-2923
Address: 809 Brant street Suite 2
Burlington Ontario L7R 2J4
Phone: (905) 632-1329
Fax: (905) 632-9015
Address: 33 Blair Rd
Cambridge ON N1S 2H7
Phone: 905-338-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 824 King ST. West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E3
Phone: 1-519-579-2002
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-100 Victoria St S
Kitchener ON N2G 4Y9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-72 Victoria St S
unit 101
Kitchener ON N2G 4Y9
Phone: 905-338-3331
Fax: 9053382923
Address: 1408 Ernest Ave #205
London Ontario N6E 3B2
Phone: 1-519-685-6719
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-931 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N5Z 3H9
Phone: 905-338-3331
Fax: 905-338-2923
Address: 101 The Queensway West, Suite 202
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-1114
Fax: (905) 272-1147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 May 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AWAD IBRAHIM AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AWAD IBRAHIM AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 04 Apr 2014
Summary of Decision:
On April 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Awad committed acts of professional misconduct. Dr. Awad admitted and the Committee found that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect to his care of thirteen sleep medicine patients; Dr. Awad pleaded no contest to and the Committee found that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in relation to his billing of OHIP for sleep medicine consultations.

Dr. Awad is a psychiatrist, practising sleep medicine. He is a diplomate of the American Board of Sleep Medicine.

The independent expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Awad failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to twelve of fifteen patient charts reviewed. Examples of concerns include:

a) He routinely directed nasal Continuous Positive Airway Pressure (CPAP) pressure titration studies after the patients had undergone sleep studies without having seen and evaluated the patients in question.
b) A patient had received immovane (5 mg) prior to CPAP titration study, without a physician assessment or clear physician's order. On the basis of severe obstructive sleep apnea and information provided by the family doctor in the patient's referral form, the patient could be seen to be at risk of hypoventilation and excessive daytime somnolence.
c) In one instance, he signed an Assisted Devices Program (ADP) form for the use of nasal CPAP prior to having seen the patient in consultation.
d) He, through his staff in the use of form letters, influenced patients to return to his clinic for follow-up studies, by indicating that the patient's condition was reportable to the Ministry of Transportation in case of lack of compliance to treatment recommendations.
Such communications were made even in instances when patients were not documented to have excessive daytime somnolence or worrisome driving-related problems. The expert opined that these letters were inappropriate and coercive.
e) He has delegated tasks to non-physician members of his staff inappropriately. A discussion of diagnosis and treatment cannot be made by telephone by unqualified clerical and technical staff.

In response to the concerns identified by the expert, Dr. Awad has changed his practice.

Regarding a complaint by Patient A, the independent expert opined that Dr. Awad failed to maintain the standard of practice as follows:
a) His letter to Patient A's family physician provides evidence that the clinic was predisposed to CPAP therapy before patients had been seen by a sleep physician;
b) His records of care show that he misinformed the referring physician by declaring Patient A to have a condition reportable to the Ministry of Transportation, before the patient had been seen or assessed by a sleep physician.

Regarding the finding of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct, Dr. Awad's office had billed OHIP for consultations, listing Dr. X as the referring physician in relation to 29 patients. Dr. X indicated that he does not and never has referred patients to Dr. Awad and that he has no record of having seen any of these 29 patients.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

the Registrar suspend Dr. Awad's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, to commence immediately.
the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Awad's certificate of registration:
Practice Assessment

i. Dr. Awad, at his own expense, shall submit to an assessment of his practice by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the date of this order. The assessor shall focus the assessment upon the deficiencies identified in the review of Dr. Awad's practice and shall additionally consider Dr. Awad's performance as Quality Advisor as referenced in the Independent Health Facilities Act, Ontario Regulation 57/92.
ii. Dr. Awad shall abide by all reasonable recommendations of the Assessor.
Dr. Awad appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
Dr. Awad pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 4, 2014

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 04 Apr 2014
Summary of Decision:
On April 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Awad committed acts of professional misconduct. Dr. Awad admitted and the Committee found that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect to his care of thirteen sleep medicine patients; Dr. Awad pleaded no contest to and the Committee found that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in relation to his billing of OHIP for sleep medicine consultations.

Dr. Awad is a psychiatrist, practising sleep medicine. He is a diplomate of the American Board of Sleep Medicine.

The independent expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Awad failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to twelve of fifteen patient charts reviewed. Examples of concerns include:

a) He routinely directed nasal Continuous Positive Airway Pressure (CPAP) pressure titration studies after the patients had undergone sleep studies without having seen and evaluated the patients in question.
b) A patient had received immovane (5 mg) prior to CPAP titration study, without a physician assessment or clear physician's order. On the basis of severe obstructive sleep apnea and information provided by the family doctor in the patient's referral form, the patient could be seen to be at risk of hypoventilation and excessive daytime somnolence.
c) In one instance, he signed an Assisted Devices Program (ADP) form for the use of nasal CPAP prior to having seen the patient in consultation.
d) He, through his staff in the use of form letters, influenced patients to return to his clinic for follow-up studies, by indicating that the patient's condition was reportable to the Ministry of Transportation in case of lack of compliance to treatment recommendations.
Such communications were made even in instances when patients were not documented to have excessive daytime somnolence or worrisome driving-related problems. The expert opined that these letters were inappropriate and coercive.
e) He has delegated tasks to non-physician members of his staff inappropriately. A discussion of diagnosis and treatment cannot be made by telephone by unqualified clerical and technical staff.

In response to the concerns identified by the expert, Dr. Awad has changed his practice.

Regarding a complaint by Patient A, the independent expert opined that Dr. Awad failed to maintain the standard of practice as follows:
a) His letter to Patient A's family physician provides evidence that the clinic was predisposed to CPAP therapy before patients had been seen by a sleep physician;
b) His records of care show that he misinformed the referring physician by declaring Patient A to have a condition reportable to the Ministry of Transportation, before the patient had been seen or assessed by a sleep physician.

Regarding the finding of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct, Dr. Awad's office had billed OHIP for consultations, listing Dr. X as the referring physician in relation to 29 patients. Dr. X indicated that he does not and never has referred patients to Dr. Awad and that he has no record of having seen any of these 29 patients.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

the Registrar suspend Dr. Awad's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, to commence immediately.
the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Awad's certificate of registration:
Practice Assessment

i. Dr. Awad, at his own expense, shall submit to an assessment of his practice by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the date of this order. The assessor shall focus the assessment upon the deficiencies identified in the review of Dr. Awad's practice and shall additionally consider Dr. Awad's performance as Quality Advisor as referenced in the Independent Health Facilities Act, Ontario Regulation 57/92.
ii. Dr. Awad shall abide by all reasonable recommendations of the Assessor.
Dr. Awad appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
Dr. Awad pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 4, 2014

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 1986