THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:53:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Department of Pediatrics,
Mount Sinai Hospital,
600 University Avenue,
Toronto, Ontario M5G 1X5
Date Received: 27 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shoo Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Department of Pediatrics,
Mount Sinai Hospital,
600 University Avenue,
Toronto, Ontario M5G 1X5
Date Received: 27 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shoo Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1989

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 1986