THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South, North York, Ontario M3J 1Y6
(416) 398-0638
Toll fee: 1 (888) 563-3732
Fax: 1 (877) 398-5932
[email protected]
Date Received: 12 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South, North York, Ontario M3J 1Y6
(416) 398-0638
Toll fee: 1 (888) 563-3732
Fax: 1 (877) 398-5932
[email protected]
Date Received: 12 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Jan 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Janos PETO to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 23, 2020:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Peto’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

Dr. Peto will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Peto will engage in professional education including in geriatrics, and diagnosis and treatment of dementia.

Dr. Peto’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 23 Jan 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Janos PETO to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 23, 2020:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Peto’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

Dr. Peto will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Peto will engage in professional education including in geriatrics, and diagnosis and treatment of dementia.

Dr. Peto’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 1986