THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:15:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Urology
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7120
Fax: (905) 472-2971
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 830 Dixon Road
Clearpoint Health Network
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z5
Phone: (416) 572-5972
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Hospital
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Urology
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7120
Fax: (905) 472-2971
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 830 Dixon Road
Clearpoint Health Network
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z5
Phone: (416) 572-5972
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4 Campbell Dr
Uxbridge Hospital
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVIDIS HAGOP BOUDAKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDAKIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVIDIS HAGOP BOUDAKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDAKIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986