THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can contact RSRS to access a copy of their file. They can be reached at ph # 1.888.563.3732, fax # 1.877.398.5932, https://www.recordsolutions.ca/.
Date Received: 11 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nina Kryshtalskyj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can contact RSRS to access a copy of their file. They can be reached at ph # 1.888.563.3732, fax # 1.877.398.5932, https://www.recordsolutions.ca/.
Date Received: 11 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nina Kryshtalskyj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 May 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 May 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986