THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:50:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location as per above.
471 Rougemount Dr
Pickering, ON L1W 2B8
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Manassis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jun 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location as per above.
471 Rougemount Dr
Pickering, ON L1W 2B8
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Manassis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jun 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2018


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986