THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:43:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stella Psarakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stella Psarakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 20 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986