THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:17:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P.O.  BOX 91102 RPO Bayview Village
North York Ontario M2K 1HO
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-616-2294
Fax: 8555208773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 07 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Kirwin, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kirwin (CPSO#: 56903 )
Business Address: Oakdale Professional Medical Centre
402 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 745-2314

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P.O.  BOX 91102 RPO Bayview Village
North York Ontario M2K 1HO
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-616-2294
Fax: 8555208773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 07 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Kirwin, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kirwin (CPSO#: 56903 )
Business Address: Oakdale Professional Medical Centre
402 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 745-2314

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE JOSEPH KIRWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRWIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE JOSEPH KIRWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRWIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986