THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:02:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Feb 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kane Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Feb 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kane Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2013

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986