THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:34:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint Mental Health Centre
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055493181
Extension: 2591
Fax: 7055490266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Lepage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint Mental Health Centre
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055493181
Extension: 2591
Fax: 7055490266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Lepage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Oct 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ALLISON LEPAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ALLISON LEPAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986