THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:56:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto General Division
200 Elizabeth Street
12 N 214
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3592
Fax: (416) 340-3314

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto General Division
200 Elizabeth Street
12 N 214
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3592
Fax: (416) 340-3314

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE JUNE DONAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE JUNE DONAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986