THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goetz (CPSO#: 57054 )
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400 Extn: 2290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goetz (CPSO#: 57054 )
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400 Extn: 2290

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986