THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. J. Szozda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. J. Szozda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 30 Jan 2019
Summary of Decision:
On January 30, 2019, on the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Szozda committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

STATEMENT OF UNCONTESTED FACTS

Dr. Szozda is 57 years old and practises family medicine in Kitchener, Ontario. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College, and his specialist designation in family medicine in 1988.

Patient A was a patient of Dr. Szozda’s from 1992 to 2016. During appointments with Patient A, Dr. Szozda made inappropriate and unprofessional comments to her, and engaged in inappropriate and unprofessional conduct towards her as follows:

a) In May 2013, Patient A attended an appointment with Dr. Szozda for an assessment of her acne.As she was sitting in a chair facing him, Dr. Szozda leaned over and lowered the top of her shirt to expose the upper chest above the bra line to examine her chest for acne. Dr.Szozda then told her to stand up and turn around, and pulled up her shirt at the back to determine if she had any acne on her upper back as well. Dr. Szozda did not adequately explain his examination of Patient A’s upper chest and back before performing it. The inadequate explanation caused Patient A to be alarmed;

b) During the appointment in May 2013, Dr. Szozda assessed Patient A’s need for oral contraceptives, both as a matter of birth control, and to determine the combination of therapies to treat her acne. In doing so, Dr. Szozda inappropriately asked Patient A if she had a boyfriend. When Patient A replied that she did not have a boyfriend, Dr. Szozda replied “Oh really, a pretty girl like you?” It was inappropriate of Dr. Szozda to comment on Patient A’s appearance;

c) In August 2014, Dr. Szozda performed a pelvic examination on Patient A. The examination required her to be undressed from the waist down. She was provided with a gown. During the pelvic examination, before inserting the speculum, Dr. Szozda made an unnecessary and inappropriate comment to Patient A regarding the number of fingers he was able to insert into her introital opening. Patient A was upset by his comment;

d) After the pelvic examination, Patient A was not given sufficient privacy to change back into her own clothes. Dr. Szozda remained in the examination room, with his back turned to the patient, looking at his computer screen and typing his chart notes into his electronic medical record;

e) After Patient A was fully clothed, Dr. Szozda briefly hugged Patient A. This was inappropriate in the circumstances and demonstrated poor judgment. The hug made Patient A uncomfortable;

f) Between 2014 and 2015, Patient A had an ongoing problem with yeast infections. She had several vaginal examinations by Dr. Szozda in that period. Each time she was asked to undress from the waist down, Dr. Szozda failed to give her sufficient privacy when putting her clothes back on. Dr. Szozda remained in the room, looking at the computer, which did not adequately protect the patient’s privacy.

In May 2017, Patient A submitted a complaint to the College regarding Dr. Szozda’s inappropriate conduct and comments.

Dr. Szozda does not contest the above facts, and does not contest that, based on these facts, he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

DISPOSITION

The Discipline Committee ordered that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. Szozda’s certificate of registration for a period of 2 months, - effective February 1, 2019.
- Dr. Szozda attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Szozda’s certificate of registration:
o Dr. Szozda will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and boundaries, at his own expense, by obtaining an unconditional pass, and will provide proof of completion to the College within 8 months from the date of this Order.
- Dr. Szozda to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 30, 2019 9:00 start time

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Feb 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Timothy James Peter Szozda to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2020:

College investigations were conducted into Dr. Szozda’s conduct with patients in his family medicine practice. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Szozda resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Sep 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 30 Jan 2019
Summary of Decision:
On January 30, 2019, on the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Szozda committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

STATEMENT OF UNCONTESTED FACTS

Dr. Szozda is 57 years old and practises family medicine in Kitchener, Ontario. He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College, and his specialist designation in family medicine in 1988.

Patient A was a patient of Dr. Szozda’s from 1992 to 2016. During appointments with Patient A, Dr. Szozda made inappropriate and unprofessional comments to her, and engaged in inappropriate and unprofessional conduct towards her as follows:

a) In May 2013, Patient A attended an appointment with Dr. Szozda for an assessment of her acne.As she was sitting in a chair facing him, Dr. Szozda leaned over and lowered the top of her shirt to expose the upper chest above the bra line to examine her chest for acne. Dr.Szozda then told her to stand up and turn around, and pulled up her shirt at the back to determine if she had any acne on her upper back as well. Dr. Szozda did not adequately explain his examination of Patient A’s upper chest and back before performing it. The inadequate explanation caused Patient A to be alarmed;

b) During the appointment in May 2013, Dr. Szozda assessed Patient A’s need for oral contraceptives, both as a matter of birth control, and to determine the combination of therapies to treat her acne. In doing so, Dr. Szozda inappropriately asked Patient A if she had a boyfriend. When Patient A replied that she did not have a boyfriend, Dr. Szozda replied “Oh really, a pretty girl like you?” It was inappropriate of Dr. Szozda to comment on Patient A’s appearance;

c) In August 2014, Dr. Szozda performed a pelvic examination on Patient A. The examination required her to be undressed from the waist down. She was provided with a gown. During the pelvic examination, before inserting the speculum, Dr. Szozda made an unnecessary and inappropriate comment to Patient A regarding the number of fingers he was able to insert into her introital opening. Patient A was upset by his comment;

d) After the pelvic examination, Patient A was not given sufficient privacy to change back into her own clothes. Dr. Szozda remained in the examination room, with his back turned to the patient, looking at his computer screen and typing his chart notes into his electronic medical record;

e) After Patient A was fully clothed, Dr. Szozda briefly hugged Patient A. This was inappropriate in the circumstances and demonstrated poor judgment. The hug made Patient A uncomfortable;

f) Between 2014 and 2015, Patient A had an ongoing problem with yeast infections. She had several vaginal examinations by Dr. Szozda in that period. Each time she was asked to undress from the waist down, Dr. Szozda failed to give her sufficient privacy when putting her clothes back on. Dr. Szozda remained in the room, looking at the computer, which did not adequately protect the patient’s privacy.

In May 2017, Patient A submitted a complaint to the College regarding Dr. Szozda’s inappropriate conduct and comments.

Dr. Szozda does not contest the above facts, and does not contest that, based on these facts, he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

DISPOSITION

The Discipline Committee ordered that:
- The Registrar suspend Dr. Szozda’s certificate of registration for a period of 2 months, - effective February 1, 2019.
- Dr. Szozda attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Szozda’s certificate of registration:
o Dr. Szozda will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and boundaries, at his own expense, by obtaining an unconditional pass, and will provide proof of completion to the College within 8 months from the date of this Order.
- Dr. Szozda to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 30, 2019 9:00 start time

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Feb 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Timothy James Peter Szozda to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2020:

College investigations were conducted into Dr. Szozda’s conduct with patients in his family medicine practice. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Szozda resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Sep 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 Apr 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986