THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7121
Fax: (905) 472-6586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wallman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7121
Fax: (905) 472-6586

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wallman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD ANDREW WALLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD ANDREW WALLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986