THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 14:29:32 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frances Keating Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Keating (CPSO#: 57171 )
Business Address: 333 River Road
Thessalon Ontario P0R 1L0
(705) 842-2905
Business Address: 97 Garden Bay Rd
Bruce Mines ON P0R 1C0
7052556785

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frances Keating Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Keating (CPSO#: 57171 )
Business Address: 333 River Road
Thessalon Ontario P0R 1L0
(705) 842-2905
Business Address: 97 Garden Bay Rd
Bruce Mines ON P0R 1C0
7052556785

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCES MARY KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCES MARY KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986