THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:26:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZAD BONNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZAD BONNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 05 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986