THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:50:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7070 Boulevard Perras
Hôpital en santé mentale Rivière-des-Prairies
SIAP-Est
Bureau E2.542
Montréal Québec H1G 0A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-323-7260
Extension: 2826
Fax: 514-323-3267
Address: 5689 Boulevard Rosemont
Hôpital Maisonneuve-Rosemont
Pavillon Rosement
Montréal Québec H1T 3W5
Phone: 514-252-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7070 Boulevard Perras
Hôpital en santé mentale Rivière-des-Prairies
SIAP-Est
Bureau E2.542
Montréal Québec H1G 0A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-323-7260
Extension: 2826
Fax: 514-323-3267
Address: 5689 Boulevard Rosemont
Hôpital Maisonneuve-Rosemont
Pavillon Rosement
Montréal Québec H1T 3W5
Phone: 514-252-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENZO GIOVANNI FRANCO DI NICOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI NICOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENZO GIOVANNI FRANCO DI NICOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI NICOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986