THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:25:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Edward Hurst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Edward Hurst Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 01 Dec 1997
Summary of Decision:
In December 1997, Dr. Hurst pleaded guilty to the charge of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional as defined in paragraph 1(1)33 of Regulation 856/93. The Discipline Committee accepted his plea, and found Dr. Hurst guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1) that Dr. Hurst was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2) that Dr. Hurst s certificate of registration shall be suspended for eight weeks, on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, before March 1, 1998. The suspension shall be removed after eight weeks upon compliance with the following terms and conditions:

a) that Dr. Hurst has completed sessions in the management of clinical boundaries and the management of boundary violations with Dr. ____ until Dr. ______ is satisfied that further sessions are not necessary; and

b) that Dr. Hurst has instructed Dr. ____ to report, and Dr. ___has reported, to the Registrar. This report will include Dr. ___ s assessment, the nature of the intervention and his satisfaction with the outcome in terms of D. Hurst s understanding and management of clinical boundaries and boundary violations.

c) that Dr. Hurst has started a course of treatment by a certified psychiatrist or a psychologist who is a member of the College of Psychologists of Ontario,
acceptable to the Registrar, who is knowledgeable about the facts resulting in the finding of professional misconduct in this order, and who agrees to provide reports acceptable to the Registrar six months and one year after the start of the treatment program; and

d) that Dr. Hurst has agreed to continue in the treatment program and follow the advice of the psychiatrist or psychologist, for as long as the psychiatrist or
psychologist considers treatment to be advisable.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 01, 1997

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 01 Dec 1997
Summary of Decision:
In December 1997, Dr. Hurst pleaded guilty to the charge of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional as defined in paragraph 1(1)33 of Regulation 856/93. The Discipline Committee accepted his plea, and found Dr. Hurst guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1) that Dr. Hurst was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2) that Dr. Hurst s certificate of registration shall be suspended for eight weeks, on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, before March 1, 1998. The suspension shall be removed after eight weeks upon compliance with the following terms and conditions:

a) that Dr. Hurst has completed sessions in the management of clinical boundaries and the management of boundary violations with Dr. ____ until Dr. ______ is satisfied that further sessions are not necessary; and

b) that Dr. Hurst has instructed Dr. ____ to report, and Dr. ___has reported, to the Registrar. This report will include Dr. ___ s assessment, the nature of the intervention and his satisfaction with the outcome in terms of D. Hurst s understanding and management of clinical boundaries and boundary violations.

c) that Dr. Hurst has started a course of treatment by a certified psychiatrist or a psychologist who is a member of the College of Psychologists of Ontario,
acceptable to the Registrar, who is knowledgeable about the facts resulting in the finding of professional misconduct in this order, and who agrees to provide reports acceptable to the Registrar six months and one year after the start of the treatment program; and

d) that Dr. Hurst has agreed to continue in the treatment program and follow the advice of the psychiatrist or psychologist, for as long as the psychiatrist or
psychologist considers treatment to be advisable.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 01, 1997

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 30 Apr 1998
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Feb 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 12 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1998

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1988

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986