THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 4289
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bauer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Robert D. Levitan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 4289
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bauer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2021

Corporation Name: Robert D. Levitan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT DANIEL LEVITAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT DANIEL LEVITAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986