THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:04:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C/O COSTI
Suite 105
1700 Wilson Ave.
Toronto Ontario M3L 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 230-1039
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 550 Queen Street East
COTA
201
Toronto Ontario M5A 1V2
Phone: 4162602826
Fax: 4167859358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C/O COSTI
Suite 105
1700 Wilson Ave.
Toronto Ontario M3L 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 230-1039
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 550 Queen Street East
COTA
201
Toronto Ontario M5A 1V2
Phone: 4162602826
Fax: 4167859358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAOLA LEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAOLA LEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986