THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:20:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN, GREEK, MACEDONIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN, GREEK, MACEDONIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 14 May 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vasia Stefou to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 14, 2025:
 
Following concerns about his standard of practice, Dr. Stefou underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report raised continued concerns about his general medicine practice. As a result, Dr. Stefou resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 14 May 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vasia Stefou to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 14, 2025:
 
Following concerns about his standard of practice, Dr. Stefou underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report raised continued concerns about his general medicine practice. As a result, Dr. Stefou resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 May 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 May 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986