THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:06:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Harding Blvd. W
Unit 101A
Royal Medical Center
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-770-8480
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Harding Blvd. W
Unit 101A
Royal Medical Center
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-770-8480
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA ELAINE SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA ELAINE SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986