THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:01:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 25 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1986