THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MALAY

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601 Center St
Merrill IA 51038-5006
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 715-539-2103
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MALAY
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601 Center St
Merrill IA 51038-5006
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 715-539-2103
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHOON HEONG P'NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. P'NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHOON HEONG P'NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. P'NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1986