THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:30:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4711 Yonge St
10th Floor
North York ON M2N 6K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164908347
Fax: 4164900953

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4711 Yonge St
10th Floor
North York ON M2N 6K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164908347
Fax: 4164900953

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK NOTKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK NOTKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Mar 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Mar 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1986