THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 27 & Finch Pediatrics
6620 Finch Ave West, Unit 6-7
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 985 4236
Fax: 416 747 9441
Address: Sick Kids
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: 416 813 5859
Fax: 4168135327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 27 & Finch Pediatrics
6620 Finch Ave West, Unit 6-7
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 985 4236
Fax: 416 747 9441
Address: Sick Kids
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: 416 813 5859
Fax: 4168135327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 1994

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1986