THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:00:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit Medical Solutions
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 28 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RJ Morrow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Docudavit Medical Solutions
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 28 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RJ Morrow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1986