THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:13:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Rome, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General &Thorac Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: (416) 813-7477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Agostino Pierro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Rome, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General &Thorac Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: (416) 813-7477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 23 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Agostino Pierro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Apr 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 23 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Agostino Pierro may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Division of General
Surgery, Department of Surgery, in which Dr. Pierro holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Pierro no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.





VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Agostino Pierro may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Division of General
Surgery, Department of Surgery, in which Dr. Pierro holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Pierro no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.





Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Rome, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1988

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986